Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Michael Thiel Debski, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: THOMAS SUSAN T OR16816PG1573-006; VER: F; K Vol./Book 16816, Page 1573, 006 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (10-039) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS MLD TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: THOMAS SUSAN T; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 122809-MLD AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 052908; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 052908 11:00; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.