Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Odom, George R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by L Alexander Vance, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM NON SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM / NON-SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE (SRS DISPO) Comment: CASE DISPOSED BY JUDGE; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING Comment: NOTICE OF DROPPING LINDA WITHERS ONLY W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING CASE TO REMAIN PENDING; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING Comment: ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 032107 3:15; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.