Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Saine, James D, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Karen S Keaton, against Skant, Tracy, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUE TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OR14718PG1988-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14718, Page 1988, 001 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
November 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
October 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.