Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cacv Of Colorado Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Richard Valle, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeANDRINGA, HENRY J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (09-046) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: BARBER CARL D OR15466PG0438-002; VER: F; K Vol./Book 15466, Page 0438, 002 pages
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 103006 AS FOLLOWS:; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: BARBER CARL D; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: STIPULATED MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (2) 02/2008; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 046 FROM SECTION SPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.