Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Patrick R Vincent, against Stuart, Janet, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 044 FROM SECTION SPC BY 1798 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Comment: STIPULATION/ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (1:00 PM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT Comment: NOTICE PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMT; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ VIA P/S; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 02/09 @ 1:00 J/HESSINGER; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $155.00; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.