Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Blake M Carlton, against Jackson, Lorna T, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 048 FROM SECTION NPC BY 1798 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Comment: NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE /ATTEMPTS TO LOCATE DEFENDANT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 2/7 @ 1:00 J/VACCARO; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $255.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.