Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Butler, April, Fanourios I Ferderigos M D P A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Reeder, Esq, against Progressive Auto Pro Insurance Company, represented by Adam R Filthaut, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Comment: JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE OR15445PG1773-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15445, Page 1773, 001 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 045 FROM SECTION SPC BY 8463 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Comment: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Comment: RESET NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES HRG 12/21 @ 10:30 J/FULLERTON; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE Comment: NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE: RESET PTC; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (10:30 AM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: 12/21/06 @ 10:30 AM SPC (WITHIN 90 DAYS); VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (REVISED); VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.