Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alabama Credit Corporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Scott B Chapman, against Bufford, Joseph T, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 774305 $100.00; VER: N; A
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: DART, LAURIE A, STAFF COUNSEL; VER: N; A
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: GARN ATTY FEES/JUDG 113007 ALABAMA V BUFFORD; VER: N; A
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Comment: JUDGMENT ON CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR16073PG0981-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16073, Page 0981, 001 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Comment: NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Comment: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE PINELLAS COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD; VER: F; G
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
September 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
CC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Comment: C/C CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETD SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
September 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
CC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Comment: C/C CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SHF/PINELLAS COUNTY; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.