Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American General Financial Services Of, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Baylor, David R, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT OR16923PG2699-001; VER: R; P Vol./Book 16923, Page 2699, 001 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 731235 $100.00; VER: N; A
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: GARN ATTY FEES/JUDG 020607 AMERICAN V BAYLOR; VER: N; A
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES; VER: N; A
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Comment: JUDGMENT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER TO DISBURSE DEPOSIT OR15622PG0835-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15622, Page 0835, 002 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTN JUDGMENT OF CONTIUING GARNISHMENT/TAXATION OF COSTS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Comment: NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Comment: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE EASTERN FLEET REMARKETING LLC; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.