Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Settlement Funding Llc, filed a(n) Declaratory - Circuit case represented by Jeffrey B Bock, against In Re, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDOWNEY, BRANDT C, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDeclaratory - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES DONE SB 07/02/07; VER: N; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES / MAILED ON 01/31/07 DB; VER: N; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES / MAILED ON 01/22/07 DB; VER: N; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER APPROVING APPLICATION OR14898PG1792-008; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14898, Page 1792, 008 pages
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TRANSFER STRUCT SETTLEMENT PAY RIGHTS Comment: NOT. TRANSF STRUCT SETTLEMENT PAY RIGHTS; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 012606 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION 015 BY 9965 - RANDOM CI; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.