Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Budget Rent A Car Systems Inc, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert Klien Bowen, against Bahora, Cary Michael, represented by Angela C Mason, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Comment: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.