Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stephen A Finamore, against Florida State Of, Hall, Christopher D, Mckinney, Sylvia, Morrow, Tina, Pinellas County, (total of 7) See All represented by Richard B Badgley, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with QUESADA, FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY OF RECEIPT-RETURNED ORIG NOTE & MTG Comment: COPY OF RECEIPT/RETURNED ORIG NOTE & MTG; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
August 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DIRECT CLERK TO RELEASE DOCUMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: DIRECT CLERK RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRECTED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Comment: CANCEL NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR15276PG1432-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15276, Page 1432, 002 pages
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Lis Pendens Recording - Fee Paid $ Comment: LIS PENDENS RECORDING FEE PAID - $13.00; VER: N; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RECORDING FEE; VER: F; K
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
|
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: QUESADA, FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.