Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arthur A Schleman Plumbing Co, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by A J Musial, Jr, against Kloczko, Ryszard, Kloczko, Anna, represented by Anthony Patrick Granese, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAEFER, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAEFER, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
WITH PREJUDICE Comment: WITH PREJUDICE /RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: N; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comment: MOTION DISMISS COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL SETTLED; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Comment: MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: AMENDED NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE 033007 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 033007 9:00; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
|
February 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAEFER, JOHN A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.