Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Centurion Capital Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mindy Rennard, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BAIRD, W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBAIRD, W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING OFFER TO PAY LESS THAN FULL AMOUNT; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES AND; VER: N; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Comment: NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
POST JUDGMENT NOTICE TO SETTLE Comment: POST JUDGMENT NOTICE TO SETTLE/COMPLIANCE NOTICE (2); VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR15999PG0960-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15999, Page 0960, 001 pages
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 092807 1:45 (TELEPHONIC); VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
|
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS / INTEREST ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: BAIRD, W DOUGLAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.