Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Duncan, Doyley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Eutzler, Matthew Enos, represented by Eduardo R Latour, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with BOYER, BRUCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOYER, BRUCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
August 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
August 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY/FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
August 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR15931PG2554-001; VER: N; D Vol./Book 15931, Page 2554, 001 pages
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION OF Comment: DEPOSITION OF IRIS DEROCHA 050207; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF MATTHEW ENOS EUTZLER; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 080807 9:00; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
|
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VER: F; D
Judge: BOYER, BRUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.