Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by L Joseph Hoffman, against St Petersburg Florida City Of, Nicholas Financial Inc, Mckinney, Sylvia, Hall, Christopher, represented by Richard B Badgley, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHAFER, WALTER L, JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
July 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE MLD TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR15249PG0913-001; VER: R; K Vol./Book 15249, Page 0913, 001 pages
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Doc Stamps - Fee Paid $ Comment: DOC STAMPS - FEE PAID $.70; VER: N; P
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $60.00; VER: N; P
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST CO; VER: F; K
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Comment: PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE; VER: F; P
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Sale/Copy To Gulf Coast Bus Rev Comment: NOTICE OF SALE/COPY TO GULF COAST BUS REV; VER: F; K
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
|
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: SCHAFER, WALTER L, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.