Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Handyman Home Repair Service Of Pinellas Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Daniel J Grieco, Ii, against Haley, Tammy, Haley, Larry, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 047 FROM SECTION 048 ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 048 FROM SECTION NPC BY 1798 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL 121405; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (9:00 AM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED LARRY HALEY SERVED 110905; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED TAMMY HALEY SERVED 110905; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 12/13 @ 9:00 J/VACCARO; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ VIA ATTY; VER: N; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.