Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jonathan R Singer, Esq, against Harris, Sheila M, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 044 FROM SECTION SPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (10:30 AM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE Comment: NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE: PENDING BANKRUPTCY; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
November 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
November 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Suggestion Of Bankruptcy Comment: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY SHEIL M HARRIS; VER: F; D
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
October 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ VIA P/S; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
October 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 12/15 @ 10:30 J/GRUBE; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
October 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $155.00; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.