Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American General Finance Of America Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Sidney E Lewis, against Shelton, Quint E, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO TELEPHONIC; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION -TELEPHONIC; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO QUINT E SHELTON; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA FOR DEPO Comment: SUBPOENA FOR DEPO - SERVED (TELEPHONIC); VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (TELEPHONIC); VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA FOR DEPO Comment: SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPO NOT SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA Comment: SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPO - SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (TELEPHONIC); VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.