Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Unifund Ccr Partners G P, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jonathan R Singer, Esq, against Mcfadden, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 045 FROM SECTION SPC BY 8461 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLURIES NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Comment: PLURIES NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLURIES NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: PLURIES NOTICE TO PLTF/PLTF ATTY 1/17 @ 1:00 J/FULLERTON; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ PS/HEAVEN SENT; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PLURIES SUMMONS Comment: REQUEST FOR 2ND PLURIES SUMMONS; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM Comment: 2ND PLURIES STATEMENT OF CLAIM; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.