Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Palisades Collection Llc, Providian National Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Arthur Drew Rubin, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (06-048) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: BLANCATO VICTORIA OR15303PG1813-003; VER: F; K Vol./Book 15303, Page 1813, 003 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
July 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
July 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 080206 AS FOLLOWS; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
July 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 A Comment: BLANCATO VICTORIA; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 048 FROM SECTION NPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF Comment: DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (1:30 PM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.