Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalier Corporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Gregg Horowitz, against Davis, Ruth E, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
WRIT OF EXECUTION Doc # 4 ENTERED
Date: May 18, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Doc # 2
Date: May 06, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 1
Date: April 23, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 3 Vol./Book 14964, Page 2508
Date: February 23, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION Doc # 4 ENTERED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Doc # 2
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 1
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT CLAIM; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 3 Vol./Book 14964, Page 2508
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES /COST; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: ATTU FEE $185.00 COST; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.