Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Centurion Capital Corporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Fleisher, against Palmer, Patricia Z, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 048 FROM SECTION NPC BY 1798 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED Comment: NO SERVICE LETTER MAILED TO PLTF ATTY; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED NOT SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice To Plaintiff/Hrg Comment: NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF/HRG 11/08 @3:30 J/VACCARO; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ /SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION NPC BY 4135 - MANUAL SC; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE FILED
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $155.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.