Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcclure, Jane M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jerome B Blevins, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DEMERS, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEMERS, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR17460PG0479-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 17460, Page 0479, 001 pages
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL REACHED AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
October 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 100711 11:00; VER: F; D
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 100711 11:00; VER: F; D
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Comment: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 101311 9:30; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION RETD BY PO; VER: F; D
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; VER: F; D
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Comment: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Comment: NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL; VER: F; P
Judge: DEMERS, DAVID A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.