Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hansen, Cathy Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hansen, Myron Marold, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, BONNIE S presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
FAXED OR PHOTO COPY OF Comment: FAXED OR PHOTO COPY OF: FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR15122PG1415-003; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15122, Page 1415, 003 pages
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Comment: EXHIBIT 2 AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Comment: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
PETITIONER'S FINANCIAL STATEMENT-AFFIDAVIT Comment: FINANCIAL STATEMENT/AFFIDAVIT; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.