Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Main Street Plaza Inc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Michael E Boutzoukas, Esq, against Lodrini, Christina Individually Et Al, Lodrini, Christina, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING; VER: R; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT COUNT II OR14666PG0702-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14666, Page 0702, 002 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
COURT WORKSHEET Comment: COURT WORKSHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
September 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 100605 2:45; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT II; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Comment: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.