Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Souza-Lowe, Holly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lowe, Joseph M, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE Comment: FINDINGS/ORDER OF COURT RE: ORDER COMPANION W/10014856FD-24; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER ON MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RCVD BY COURT 092605; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14636PG2266-004; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14636, Page 2266, 004 pages
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Comment: EXHIBIT 1 COPY QUITCLAIM DEED; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
September 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER SETTING HEARING 092205 2:00; VER: F; D
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.