Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Miller, Theresa Irene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller, Jason C, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDREWS, MICHAEL F presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK Comment: CERTIFIED STATEMENT COMPLETED BY CLERK; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment Record/Report - Fee Paid $ Comment: JUDGMENT RECORD/REPORT FEE PAID $10.50; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: $10.50 FEE; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE Comment: REPORT/RECOMMEND OF GENER. MAGISTRATE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OR14351PG2130-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14351, Page 2130, 001 pages
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 051905 @ 1:30; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
|
May 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE/; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDREWS, MICHAEL F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.