Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gilmore, Nancy Fox, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Gilmore, David Lee, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction Without Kids |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR14297PG0421-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14297, Page 0421, 001 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION TO DISMISS INJUNCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
May 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE INJUNCTION ETC SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-DOM VIOLENCE Comment: FINAL JUDGEMENT OF INJUNCTION/DOM VIOL OR14281PG0973-008; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14281, Page 0973, 008 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MINKOFF, THOMAS H)
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TEMP INJUNCTION ETC SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE CALENDARED FOR Comment: CASE CALENDARED FOR 042805 11:00; VER: N; P
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.