Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Freedom Processing Services, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Safford, Joanna, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED/SENT TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OR14435PG2545-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14435, Page 2545, 001 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED JOANNA SAFFORD 052705; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Comment: CIVIL COVER SHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.