Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Providian, Cavalry Portfolio Services Llc, Cavalry Investments Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bruce E Wagner, against Clark, Donathon, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeANDRINGA, HENRY J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT OR15493PG2661-001; VER: R; P Vol./Book 15493, Page 2661, 001 pages
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
November 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 703482 $100.00; VER: N; A
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: GARN ATTY FEES/ORDER 091306 CAVALRY V CLARK; VER: N; A
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: WAGNER & HUNT PA; VER: N; A
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION DISMISS/DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT:; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO DISMISS Comment: MOTION DISMISS / DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES Comment: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY/WAGES RETD SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ACCOUNTING SHEET Comment: GARNISHMENT ACCOUNTING SHEET; VER: F; G
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.