Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lincoln Shores Apartments Investors Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by John E Mcmillan, Esq, against Barton, Jennifer Marie, Barrett, Kyle Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED/MLD TO ATTY; VER: N; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY COPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Comment: JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION OR14387PG2228-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14387, Page 2228, 001 pages
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I BOTH DEFENDANTS; VER: F; K
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT COUNT I BY CLERK AND; VER: N; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Comment: VERIFIC. OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERV; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: MOTION WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; P
Judge: HESSINGER, KATHLEEN T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.