Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ge Money Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Richard W Battaglino, against Diehl, Brigitte, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with FULLERTON, WALTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 045 FROM SECTION SPC BY 9475 - MANUAL S; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL APPROVING STIPULATION OR14476PG0640-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14476, Page 0640, 001 pages
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Comment: STIPULATION SETTLEMENT (FAX); VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Comment: NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY/HRG 08/10 @ 10:30 J/FULLERTON; VER: F; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Comment: NOTICE/STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT/ VIA SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION SPC BY 1254 - RANDOM SC; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Filing - Fee Paid Comment: SMALL CLAIMS FILING FEE PAID $155.00; VER: N; P
Judge: FULLERTON, WALTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.