Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Professional Staffing Abts Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Keenes Trucking And Land Development Inc, Keene, Teresa W, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR Comment: REQUEST FOR: CC OF FINAL JUDGMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: ADDL $9.50 NEEDED TO RECORD FJ AS; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE RE: CERTIFICATION/RECORDING; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: NEED CORRECT FEE RTD CHK; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RTD CK NEED AFFD OF ADDRESS; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
April 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
August 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.