Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yancey, Eileen D, Florida State Ofdepartment Of Revenue, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Yancey, Nathaniel, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, PETER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2005 |
CategoryForeign Judgment Registration - Uifsa - Non Ivd |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Doc # 4 CLERK'S FEES
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR Doc # 3
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE REDIRECT SUPPORT FROM DOR Doc # 2
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET Doc # 1
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
ARREARS CALCULATION SHEET W/ATTACHMENTS
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER ESTABLISHING ARREARS RECALCULATE ARREARAGE AMOUNT/PAYMENT TWARD ARREARS W/ATTACHED IDO Vol./Book 18541, Page 492, 9 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT 2
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT AS EXHIBIT 3
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT 1 - ACCOUNT STATEMENT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
HEARING (1:30 PM) (Magistrate TEARNEY, BAMA) Status Hearing on Arrears - set by CSHO on 6/30/14
Judge: RAMSBERGER, PETER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.