Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rickert, Wayne C, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Alyssa M Sells, against Weston, Jessica P, Paul, Leslie J, All Unknown Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED/SENT TO SHF; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION OR14344PG2002-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14344, Page 2002, 002 pages
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Comment: DEFAULT ENTERED /JESSICA P WESTON/LESLIE J PAUL- COUNT I; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED LESLIE J PAUL 043005; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS 043005; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED/POSTED JESSICA P WESTON 043005; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.