Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oddo, Tommy M, filed a(n) Declaratory - Circuit case represented by Marion Hale, against Adva-Lite Inc, represented by Jenna Rinehart Rassif, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryDeclaratory - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING Comment: ORDER DENYING DEFT MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT; VER: F; D
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 020906 10:30; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 015 FROM SECTION 021 BY 5347 - RANDOM N O; VER: N; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF RECUSAL Comment: ORDER OF RECUSAL; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECUSAL ORDER Comment: 021/HON JAMES R CASE /RECUSAL ORDER /ORRX; VER: N; K
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Comment: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 120105 AT 11AM; VER: F; D
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Comment: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO DISMISS; VER: F; P
Judge: DOWNEY, BRANDT C, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.