Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Premier Capital Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Richard B Storfer, against Mackenzie, Faye, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KHOUZAM, NELLY N presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Judgment Lien - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF JDMT LIEN - FEE PAID $18.50; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
July 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Comment: C/C JUDGEMENT MADE/HANDED RECORDING OR14476PG1148-002; VER: R; K Vol./Book 14476, Page 1148, 002 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Comment: PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER RECEIVED BY COURT 053105; VER: F; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Comment: AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OR14358PG2482-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14358, Page 2482, 002 pages
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Comment: JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED FAYE MACKENZIE 051205; VER: F; K
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: FAYE MACKENZIE PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
|
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Circuit Civil Filing - Fee Paid $ Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE PAID $255.00; VER: N; P
Judge: KHOUZAM, NELLY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.