Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kunnen, Guy P, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Charles A Buford, against Joseph N Perlman As Trustee Of Cerberus Holdings, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CASE, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASE, JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 29, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; VER: N; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
WITH PREJUDICE Comment: WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Comment: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
July 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL; VER: F; P
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Comment: ANSWER OF: JOSEPH N PERLMAN AS TRUSTEE OF; VER: N; D
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
ID NAME Comment: CERBERUS HOLDING PRO SE; VER: F; D
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
May 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED JOSEPH N PERLMAN AS TRUSTEE OF CERBERUS HOL; VER: F; K
Judge: CASE, JAMES R |
|
May 04, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Comment: SUMMONS RETD SERVED JOSEPH N PERLMAN AS TRUSTEE OF CERBERUS HOL; VER: F; K |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.