Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Northern Trust Bank Of Florida Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Steven M Lee, Esq, against Roundtree, Crystal Y, Mt Zion Human Services Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SHAMES, MARK I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHAMES, MARK I Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED W/CHECK; VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE MLD TO NORTHERN TRUST; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT Comment: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED: OR16429PG1688-003; VER: R; K Vol./Book 16429, Page 1688, 003 pages
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS (SUPPLEMENTAL); VER: F; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Sale - Fee Paid $70.00 Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE - FEE PAID $70.00; VER: N; P
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
|
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Comment: CERTIFICATE OF SALE NORTHERN TRUST BANK OF FLORIDA NA; VER: F; K
Judge: SHAMES, MARK I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.