Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ncr Corporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Thomas K Sciarrino, Jr, against Image Station Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT $2800.85 PRIN $305.98 INT $282.00 COST; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
November 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR14731PG2615-001; VER: N; P Vol./Book 14731, Page 2615, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Comment: MOTION FOR DEFAULT /DEFAULTS ENTERED AT PT; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Comment: AFFIDAVIT PROOF CLAIM/NON MILITARY SERVICE; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Comment: NOTICE RETURNED SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE ASSIGNED BY CLERK TO SECTION Comment: CASE ASSIGNED SECTION 047 FROM SECTION NPC ICD; VER: N; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (11:00 AM) () Result: LEGACY MINUTES
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.