Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sandra A Little, against Tenn, Pamela, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2005 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
November 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Comment: RECEIPT FOR ORIGINAL DOCUMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Copy Of Receipt-Returned Orig Note Comment: COPY OF RECEIPT/RETURNED ORIG NOTE; VER: F; K
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
RECORDED AT Comment: RECORDED AT: OR14681PG0107-001; VER: N; P Vol./Book 14681, Page 0107, 001 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE/RELEASE LOAN DOCUMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER VACATING Comment: ORDER VACATING: FINAL JUDGMENT/DISSOLVING LIS PENDENS/; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: VACATE JDMT/DISMISS/DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS/; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
EX-PARTE MOTION Comment: EX-PARTE MOTION: RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS; VER: F; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Comment: REOPEN CASE/OTHER; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Reopen Fee Paid $ Comment: RE-OPEN FEE PAID - $50.00; VER: N; P
Judge: DAY, JACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.