Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sertzel Kathy As Personal Representative, Richardson, Jardana, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by John W Williams, against Bayfront Medical Center Inc, represented by David S Nelson, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with LOGAN, WALTER D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2005 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Comment: ATTORNEY COVER LETTER; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER DISCHARGING GUARDIAN AD LITEM; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR DISCHARGE; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
July 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
July 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Comment: REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
July 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING Comment: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT FOR MINOR OR15894PG2191-002; VER: F; P Vol./Book 15894, Page 2191, 002 pages
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT FOR MINOR; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
|
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING 071707 1:00; VER: F; P
Judge: LOGAN, WALTER D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.