Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Champion, James, Champion, Eleanor, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by John E Mcmillan, Esq, against Cooper, Beverly, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with ANDRINGA, HENRY J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2005 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
ID NAME Comment: BEVERY COOPER RETD BY PO; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: COOPER BEVERLY; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROS-DISM 000000-MLD AS TO Comment: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED AS TO:; VER: N; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
June 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: RTN WRIT OF POSSESSION; VER: F; K
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 624183 $4.73; VER: N; A
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: MCMILLAN, JOHN E., ESQ.; VER: N; A
Judge: ANDRINGA, HENRY J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.