Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Andrew D Fleisher, against Graham, George, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL W/ ATTACHMENT
Date: March 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL W/ ATTACHMENT
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
COURT WORKSHEET Comment: COURT WORKSHEET; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK AN ORDER OF CONTEMPT ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT SEEK CONTEMPT ORDER/ISSUE SANCTIONS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Comment: MOTION FIND IN CIVIL CONTEMPT ETC; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK CONTEMPT/OR OTHER SANCTIONS; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
July 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED Comment: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED OF SERVICE AND INTERROGATORIES; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
June 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Comment: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SECOND); VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER DIRECTING DEFT TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
June 02, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE REOPENING CAUSE; VER: F; P
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.