Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carmel Financial Corporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Gilbert M Singer, Esq, against Davis, Sabrina, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Recording Of Satisfaction - Fee Paid $ Comment: RECORDING OF SATISFACTION - FEE PAID $10.00; VER: N; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT; VER: R; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Comment: SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE DISMISSAL WRIT GARNISHMENT WITH PREJUDICE; VER: F; P
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FROM CLERK RE REOPEN FEE REQUIRED Comment: NOTICE FROM CLERK RE: REOPEN FEE REQUIRED MT FOR DEFAULT GARNIS; VER: N; K
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Comment: CERTIFIED COPY AMENDED ORDER CONTEMPT RETD SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: GARN ATTY FEES/ORDER 012508 CARMEL V DAVIS; VER: N; A
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: KASS SHULER SOLOMON SPECTOR FOYLE & SINGER PA; VER: N; A
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 781359 $100.00; VER: N; A
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.