Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American General Financial Services Of America Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rapson, Matthew T, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER RE DEPOSIT UNCLAIMED REGISTRY FUNDS UNDER F.S.43.19 Comment: ORDER RE: DEPOSIT OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS $100.00; VER: F; C
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: TO: KENNETH L SLOMONE PA; VER: N; A
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: FOR: GARN ATTY FEES/ORDER 091008 AMERICAN V RAPSON; VER: N; A
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
TEXT Comment: COURT REGISTRY CHECK NUMBER: 814601 $100.00; VER: N; A
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
AS TO: Comment: AS TO: HOWROYD-WRIGHT AGENCY INC; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER Comment: ORDER VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL CONTINUING WRIT GARNISHMENT; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Comment: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENTOR16375PG0563-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 16375, Page 0563, 001 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Comment: C/C CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETD SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Comment: NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES; VER: F; P
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Comment: C/C CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT /MLD TO ATTY/HOWROYD WRIGHT; VER: N; K
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.