Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jennifer Sesta, against Farnham, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARASSAS, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Asset Acceptance LLC against Elizabeth Farnham. The damages in this action exceed $5000, excluding interest and court costs. Asset Acceptance LLC alleges that from 03/24/99 to 09/30/03, Farnham used her PROVIDIAN credit car...
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: September 17, 2015NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES OF ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: September 02, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT, FOR ORDER DIRECTING GARNISHEE...
Date: November 19, 2015NOTICE OF DISSOLUTION OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: July 11, 2017NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES NOTICE OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT
Date: August 25, 2015COMPLAINT AND COPY(S) Comment: COMPLAINT AND COPY(S); VER: F; P
Date: February 28, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Doc # 1
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISSOLUTION OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT/ORDER DIRECTING GARNISHEE TO DISBURSE FUNDS AND CLERK TO DISTRIBUTE DEPOSIT Vol./Book 19008, Page 1254, 2 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT, FOR ORDER DIRECTING GARNISHEE...
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES OF ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES NOTICE OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES EULEN AMERICA INC
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CC CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT MAILED TO TSI
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.