Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Stanley Erskine, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with VACCARO, DOROTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVACCARO, DOROTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2005 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY ORDER ALLOWING ADMINISTRATIVE; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Comment: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO: RONALD DOUTHERTY; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
COPY Comment: COPY BANKRUPTCY MOTION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE; VER: F; D
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: DOUGHERTY RON P OR15808PG1588-005; VER: F; K Vol./Book 15808, Page 1588, 005 pages
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Comment: MASTER ORDER (03-042) DISMISSAL CALENDAR AS FOLLOW:; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Comment: CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 Comment: DOUGHERTY RON P; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) Comment: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISM MAILED TO PLTF(S) (S)/PLTF(S) ATTY(S); VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
|
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY 000000 Comment: NOTICE INTENT DISM (LACK PROSECUTION) BY: 041607; VER: N; K
Judge: VACCARO, DOROTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.