Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jemali, Sylvia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Zeqollari, Haris, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with NEWTON, BONNIE S presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2005 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction Without Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Comment: CERTIFIED COPY ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION ETC SERVED; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Comment: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; VER: F; K
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION OR14140PG2308-001; VER: F; P Vol./Book 14140, Page 2308, 001 pages
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE: TEMP ORDER/CONTACT; VER: F; D
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
CC TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE RETD Comment: C/C TEMPORARY INJUNCTION W/O NOTICE RETD SERVED; VER: F; K
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
February 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Comment: CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE: CONTACT; VER: F; D
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
February 08, 2005 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Comment: NOTICE 2 C/C ORDER EXTENDING ETC TO SHERIFF; VER: F; K
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
February 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION Comment: ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION 022405; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
February 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
HEARING (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer NEWTON, BONNIE S)
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
|
January 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE Comment: COPY CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE: C/C INJUNCTION; VER: F; P
Judge: NEWTON, BONNIE S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.